Mack v. United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brooke Mack
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00186
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, Donna)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Brooke Mack. (Michaud, Megan)
April 1, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/12/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE RULE 26(f) REPORT. The parties are requested to file their Rule 26(f) report on or before April 12, 2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/1/2019. (Gondwe, N.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Brooke Mack (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brooke Mack. (Michaud, Megan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Leigh Michaud on behalf of Brooke Mack (Michaud, Megan)
February 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for United HealthCare Services, Inc. to 3/15/2019. (Pesta, J.)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 15, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/11/19. (Pesta, J.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 15, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by United HealthCare Services, Inc.. (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., #6 Notice of Appearance filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., #10 Standing Protective Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 02/07/19. (Barry, Donna)
February 6, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/25/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 02/06/19. (Barry, Donna)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 02/06/19. (Barry, Donna) (Barry, Donna).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2019, Discovery due by 8/8/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 02/06/19. (Barry, Donna)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 02/07/19. (Barry, Donna) Modified date filed on 2/7/2019 (Barry, Donna).
February 6, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly W. Garofalo on behalf of United HealthCare Services, Inc. (Garofalo, Beverly)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United HealthCare Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Statement Regarding Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1441 (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United HealthCare Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Notice of Pending Motions (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by United HealthCare Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simeonidis, Sara)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Simeonidis on behalf of United HealthCare Services, Inc. (Simeonidis, Sara)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United HealthCare Services, Inc. from Superior Court-JD Ansonia-Milford, case number ANN-CV19-6031744-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5149456, filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simeonidis, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Mack
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Beverly W. Garofalo
Represented By: Sara R. Simeonidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?