Vogel v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Gail Vogel
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00196
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Cases associated. Create association to 3:19-cv-00164-JAM. (Barry, Donna)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (Doc. #10). The Court GRANTS the Commissioner's motion to consolidate cases, and this case (Vogel v. Commissoner, 19cv196) shall hereinafter be consolidated with the earlier-filed case involving the same parties (Vogel v. Commissioner, 19cv164). The scheduling order that has already been entered in the earlier-filed case shall control the briefing schedule for this case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 03/15/19. (Barry, Donna)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 03/15/19. (Barry, Donna)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 19-164 by Commissioner of Social Security.Responses due by 4/4/2019 (Lechleitner, Andreea)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/7/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andreea Lechleitner on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lechleitner, Andreea)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case has been reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer who is the presiding Judge on related case 3:19-cv-00164-JAM. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 8, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 4/9/2019. Service made by Clerk via email. (Anastasio, F.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to Self-represented Parties Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/7/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/7/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gail Vogel. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Anastasio, F.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Gail Vogel. (Attachments: #1 SSA Letter, #2 Exhibit)(Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Andreea Lechleitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?