USA v. Gershon et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, FA, Town of Stamford and Lori Gershon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00204
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Lori Gershon to 5/26/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 5/26/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/11/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/26/2019 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint by Lori Gershon. (Russell, Philip)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip D. Russell on behalf of Lori Gershon (Russell, Philip)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Lien Priority and Defendants' Involvement in the Case re #12 Stipulation filed by USA. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/21/2019.(Pipech, L.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Regarding Lien Priority and Defendants' Involvement in the Case by USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Implementing Stipulation)(Sarnell, Bradley)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Town of Stamford.(Toma, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Steven Toma on behalf of Town of Stamford (Toma, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Washington Mutual Bank, FA to 3/20/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 3/20/2019 to file an Answer or Responsive Pleading. Any future motions must comply with the good cause standard of the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/5/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 20, 2019(Stipulated) to File an Answer or Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint by Washington Mutual Bank, FA. (Rich, Brian)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Rich on behalf of Washington Mutual Bank, FA n/k/a JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Rich, Brian)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lori Gershon, Town of Stamford, Washington Mutual Bank, FA* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley Alexander Sarnell* *Unites States Dept of Justice, Tax Div -pob 55* *P.O. Box 55, Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 02/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 02/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 02/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2019. Discovery due by 8/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 02/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 11, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 11, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Lori Gershon, Town of Stamford, Washington Mutual Bank, FA. (Sarnell, Bradley) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lori Gershon, Town of Stamford, Washington Mutual Bank, FA, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarnell, Bradley) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Gershon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, FA
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Stamford
Represented By: Michael Steven Toma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Gershon
Represented By: Philip D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?