Norwest Marine, Inc. v. 34' Motor Yacht bearing Hull Identification Number LHR34114C585 and the name SEA PIPER (Official # 905799) et al
Plaintiff: Norwest Marine, Inc.
Defendant: ROBERT J. CAISSIE, One 34' Motor Yacht bearing Hull Identification Number LHR34114C585 and the name SEA PIPER (Official # 905799) including its engines, generators, fishing gear, tenders, electronics, contents and 34' Motor Yacht bearing Hull Identification Number LHR34114C585 and the name SEA PIPER (Official # 905799)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00237
Filed: February 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 WARRANT FOR MARITIME ARREST IN REM issued. (Shafer, J.)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/22/2019. (Mattessich, William)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/22/2019.(Mattessich, William)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Robert J. Caissie* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John K. Fulweiler* *Fulweiler LLC* *40 Mary Street* *Newport, RI 02840*. (Velez, F.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Ex Parte Motion in Admiralty Seeing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest) filed by Norwest Marine, Inc., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Norwest Marine, Inc., #8 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Norwest Marine, Inc., #3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Ex Parte Motion in Admiralty Seeking Appointment of Substitute Custodian) filed by Norwest Marine, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/16/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/16/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/16/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2019; Discovery due by 8/18/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/16/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 16, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
February 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norwest Marine, Inc.. (Fulweiler, John)
February 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Ex Parte Motion in Admiralty Seeking Appointment of Substitute Custodian) by Norwest Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "A" (Declaration of Proposed Substitute Custodian), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulweiler, John)
February 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Ex Parte Motion in Admiralty Seeing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest) by Norwest Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Warrant of Arrest)(Fulweiler, John)
February 16, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to ROBERT J. CAISSIE. (Fulweiler, John)
February 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5161463.), filed by Norwest Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verification of In Rem Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fulweiler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwest Marine, Inc. v. 34' Motor Yacht bearing Hull Identification Number LHR34114C585 and the name SEA PIPER (Official # 905799) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. CAISSIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 34' Motor Yacht bearing Hull Identification Number LHR34114C585 and the name SEA PIPER (Official # 905799) including its engines, generators, fishing gear, tenders, electronics, contents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 34' Motor Yacht bearing Hull Identification Number LHR34114C585 and the name SEA PIPER (Official # 905799)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwest Marine, Inc.
Represented By: John K. Fulweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?