State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Uscanga et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Morgan Galdenzi, Maria Theresa Uscanga and Christian Ghiorzi
Case Number: 3:2019cv00239
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 5/16/2019. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2019. (Freberg, B)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Christian Ghiorzi by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lettiero, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, on consent. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/3/19. (Tooker, A.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 26, 2019 respond to Plaintiff's Declaratory Action Complaint by Morgan Galdenzi. (Lacobelle, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Lacobelle on behalf of Morgan Galdenzi (Lacobelle, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Maria Theresa Uscanga served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Lettiero, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Maria Theresa Uscanga served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Lettiero, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Morgan Galdenzi served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Lettiero, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Christian Ghiorzi to 3/18/2019. (Reis, Julia)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed as to Christian Ghiorzi, served on 02-25-19, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lettiero, Michael) Modified event on 3/5/2019 (Reis, Julia).
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 First Corporate Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lettiero, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Morgan Galdenzi, Christian Ghiorzi, Maria Theresa Uscanga* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael F Lettiero* *Gerber Ciano Kelly Brady LLP* *175 Capital Boulevard, 4th Floor* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Reis, Julia)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2019 Discovery due by 8/21/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 19, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Maria Theresa Uscanga. (Lettiero, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Christian Ghiorzi. (Lettiero, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Morgan Galdenzi. (Lettiero, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5162246.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Lettiero, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Uscanga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael F Lettiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Galdenzi
Represented By: Robert A. Lacobelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Theresa Uscanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Ghiorzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?