In re: Peterson
Undetermined: US Trustee
Interested Party: Kim McCabe
Appellant: Alyssa S. Peterson
Appellee: Roberta Napolitano and Robert Napolitano
Case Number: 3:2019cv00249
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Crook on behalf of Robert Napolitano appearing on behalf of Roberta Napolitano (Crook, Patrick)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by US Trustee Notice of Non-Participation (Claiborn, Holley)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/7/2019.(Gould, K.)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing . Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/7/2019. (Gould, K.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corrected/Amended Preliminary Statement of Issues on Appeal by Alyssa S. Peterson (Bozek, M.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Consent to Electronic Notice by Alyssa S. Peterson. (Bozek, M.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Alyssa S. Peterson. (Bozek, M.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Preliminary Statement of Issues on Appeal by Alyssa S. Peterson (Agati, Kathryn)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/20/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/20/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 10-23429, filed by Alyssa S. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum #677, #2 Order #673)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kim McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alyssa S. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Roberta Napolitano
Represented By: Roberta Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert Napolitano
Represented By: Patrick Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?