In re: Cottrell, Jr
Undetermined: US Trustee
Appellant: Richard James Cottrell, Jr
Appellee: Georgia Cottrell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00250
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO 10 Order to Show Cause, by Richard James Cottrell, Jr filed by Richard James Cottrell, Jr. (Miltenberger, Timothy)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Appellant is ordered to show cause why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice to filing a motion to reopen in view of Fed. R. Bank. P. 8002(b)(1) which extends the deadline for filing an appeal until a ruling on a motion for a new trial. Show Cause Response due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/14/2019. (Lindberg, Christina)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 No Designation/Agreed Statement: Filed 19-250(VLB)(RE:) 82 Notice of Appeal to District Court. 77 Judgment In Favor of the Plaintiff. (Fanelle, N.)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION To Set Briefing Schedule (Stipulated) by Richard James Cottrell, Jr.Responses due by 4/1/2019 (Miltenberger, Timothy)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court sets the following briefing deadlines. The Appellant's brief is due by 3/26/2019. The response is due by 4/16/2019. Any reply is due by 4/30/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/5/2019. (Lindberg, Christina)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/20/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/20/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/20/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 18-5021, filed by Richard James Cottrell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Judgment #77)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Cottrell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard James Cottrell, Jr
Represented By: Timothy D. Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Georgia Cottrell
Represented By: Neil Crane
Represented By: Stuart Harris Caplan
Represented By: Irve J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?