Ehresman v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Lauren Ehresman
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00263
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Latanae Parker on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Parker, Latanae)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Latanae L. Parker. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Latanae L. Parker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5237170) by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Latanae L. Parker)(Tucci, Theodore)
April 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/17/2019 (Perez, J.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 3/21/2019, answer due 5/20/2019 filed by Lauren Ehresman. (Smith, Ian)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/3/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Tucci on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Tucci, Theodore)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Lauren Ehresman, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Lauren Ehresman Signed by Clerk on 2/22/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/22/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/22/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/22/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2019 Discovery due by 8/24/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/22/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 22, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian O. Smith on behalf of Lauren Ehresman (Smith, Ian)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5168243.), filed by Lauren Ehresman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ehresman v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Ehresman
Represented By: Ian O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Latanae Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?