Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds et al v. PJ's Construction Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund and Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund
Defendant: PJ's Construction Company, Inc. and Pablo L. Jimenez
Case Number: 3:2019cv00283
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund. Pablo L. Jimenez served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019; PJ's Construction Company, Inc. served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019. (Gould, Nancy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Pablo L. Jimenez, PJ's Construction Company, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nancy Ellen Gould* *Gould Killian LLP* *280 Trumbull St., 21st Fl.* *Hartford, CT 06447*. (Reis, Julia)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, filed by Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds Signed by Clerk on 2/27/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/26/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/26/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2019 Discovery due by 8/28/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 26, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
February 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Pablo L Jimenez, PJ's Construction Company, Inc.. (Gould, Nancy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pablo L Jimenez, PJ's Construction Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5172526.), filed by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund.(Gould, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds et al v. PJ's Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ's Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo L. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?