In re: Channer
Interested Party: Bonnie Mangan
Appellee: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Undetermined: US Trustee
Appellant: Lorna Y. Channer
Case Number: 3:2019cv00319
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 Brief of Appellant by Lorna Y. Channer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bozek, M.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 Transmission of Supplemental Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Fanelle, N.)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Objection to Refusal to Transmit Relevant Records on Appeal filed in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Lorna Y. Channer. (Fanelle, N.)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel regarding briefing Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/3/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/4/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 10-21232, filed by Lorna Y. Channer. (Attachments: #1 Order #115)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Channer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bonnie Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lorna Y. Channer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?