Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Lewis
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Cynthia Lewis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00341
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Set Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 3/21/2019 (Johnson, D.)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Defendant has filed a #1 notice of removal. The notice and attachments do not appear to provide any reasonable basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. "If subject matter jurisdiction is lacking and no party has called the matter to the court's attention, the court has the duty to dismiss the action sua sponte." Durant, Nichols, Houston, Hodgson & Cortese-Costa P.C. v. Dupont, 565 F.3d 56, 62 (2d Cir. 2009).The Defendant states that removal is proper under 28 U.S.C. 1441, 1446, and 1331. She cites numerous other federal statutes and constitutional provisions, but does not provide enough information to determine their relevance in the case. She does not attach the original complaint from the state court proceeding as required under 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Federal courts may hear cases removed from state court on the basis of federal question jurisdiction only "when a federal question is presented on the face of the plaintiff's properly pleaded complaint." Caterpillar Inc. v. Williams, 482 U.S. 386, 392 (1987). The Court does not have jurisdiction if the only federal question is raised as an affirmative defense or in the Defendant's counterclaims. The removal also appears untimely. Under 28 U.S.C. 1446(b), notice of removal must be filed within 30 days after the party seeking removal receives the initial pleading or summons. A review of the state court docket suggests that Ms. Lewis has actively litigated this case in state court for more than 10 years.The Defendant is hereby ordered to show cause within seven days (3/21/2019) why this case should not be remanded to the state court from which it was removed. The Defendant's response to this order must (1) include the relevant state court pleadings; (2) identify the federal question raised on the face of those pleadings; and (3) explain why the removal was not untimely. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/14/2019. (Guevremont, Nathan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Cynthia Lewis, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2019. Discovery due by 9/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 8, 2019 Filing fee received from Cynthia Lewis: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00010000. (Fazekas, J.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cynthia Lewis from Superior Court, Bridgeport, CT, case number FBT-CV07-5006088., filed by Cynthia Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?