Starnet Insurance Company v. Tiger-Sul Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Starnet Insurance Company
Defendant: Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC and Tiger-Sul Products, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00348
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pipech, L.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 15 CANCELLATION NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: Motion to Dismiss #10 set for 6/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny is cancelled. (Rickevicius, L.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss in light of ECF No. 13. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/19/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Approved. So ORDERED re #12 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Starnet Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/19/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Starnet Insurance Company. (Tobin, Rhonda)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: Motion to Dismiss #10 set for 6/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay by Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC, Tiger-Sul Products, LLC.Responses due by 4/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Robertson, James)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Robertson, Jr on behalf of Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC, Tiger-Sul Products, LLC (Robertson, James)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT Corrected filing of Exhibit A by Starnet Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Tobin, Rhonda)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC, Tiger-Sul Products, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Rhonda J. Tobin* *Robinson & Cole* *280 Trumbull St.* *Hartford, CT 06103-3597*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Starnet Insurance Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Starnet Insurance Company, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 03/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 03/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 03/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2019. Discovery due by 9/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 03/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 8, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda J. Tobin on behalf of Starnet Insurance Company (Tobin, Rhonda)
March 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Tobin, Rhonda)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Declaratory Judgment) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5186582.), filed by Starnet Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tobin, Rhonda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starnet Insurance Company v. Tiger-Sul Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starnet Insurance Company
Represented By: Rhonda J. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger-Sul Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James K. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger-Sul Products, LLC
Represented By: James K. Robertson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?