Hassoun v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Feras S. Hassoun
Defendant: Nieves Cardinale, Nielson Kirstjen, Edward A. Newman, Lee Francis Cissna, William Barr and Kirstjen Nielson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00407
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION in OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Feras S. Hassoun filed by Feras S. Hassoun. (Oliver, T.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Barr, Nieves Cardinale, Lee Francis Cissna, Edward A. Newman, Kirstjen Nielson. (Miller, Eric)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Feras S. Hassoun. (Payton, R.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by William Barr, Nieves Cardinale, Lee Francis Cissna, Edward A. Newman, Kirstjen Nielson re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice to Pro Se Litigant (Miller, Eric)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by William Barr, Nieves Cardinale, Lee Francis Cissna, Edward A. Newman, Kirstjen Nielson.Responses due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Material Facts Rule 56(a)(1), #3 Exhibit A (Declaration of Camille Fisher))(Miller, Eric)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Benjamin Miller on behalf of William Barr, Nieves Cardinale, Lee Francis Cissna, Edward A. Newman, Kirstjen Nielson (Miller, Eric)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *William Barr, Nieves Cardinale, Lee Francis Cissna, Edward A. Newman, Kirstjen Nielson* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Feras S. Hassoun* *69 Valley Road* *Cos Cob, CT 06807-2536*. (Fanelle, N.)
April 2, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to William Barr, Nieves Cardinale, Lee Francis Cissna, Edward A. Newman, Kirstjen Nielson. (Fanelle, N.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Feras S. Hassoun Signed by Clerk on 3/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2019 Filing fee received from Feras S. Hassoun: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00010032. (Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barr, Nieves Cardinale, Lee Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielson, Edward A. Newman, filed by Feras S. Hassoun. (Attachments: #1 ID Information, #2 U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Response)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 3/19/2019 to edit text(Fazekas, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassoun v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nieves Cardinale
Represented By: Eric Benjamin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nielson Kirstjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A. Newman
Represented By: Eric Benjamin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Eric Benjamin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Eric Benjamin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielson
Represented By: Eric Benjamin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feras S. Hassoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?