Campanha v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Helen Campanha
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00417
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. (Ryan, Sarah)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ellis, Hudson)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Begos, Patrick)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time until June 17, 2019 to file Report of parties' planning meeting. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/06/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 17, 2019 to File Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Lautier, Sandra)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/2/2019, answer due 6/1/2019 filed by Helen Campanha. (Ellis, Hudson)
April 4, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/17/2019 (Perez, J.)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Marin Lautier on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Lautier, Sandra)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aetna Life Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Fazekas, J.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Helen Campanha, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 3/20/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2019. Discovery due by 9/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 19, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Ellis, Hudson)
March 19, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5199059.), filed by Helen Campanha. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet)(Ellis, Hudson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campanha v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Represented By: Sandra Marin Lautier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Campanha
Represented By: Hudson Taylor Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?