Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC v. M/Y Nipper (O.N. 1098807)
Plaintiff: Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC
Defendant: M/Y Nipper (O.N. 1098807)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00451
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of T. Abruzese, #2 Exhibit 2: Docket Report, #3 Exhibit 3: Proposed Order)(Nast, Timothy)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Order Directing Manner of Notice in light of the Court's Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for Warrant. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/12/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian in light of the Court's Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for Warrant. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/12/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem for the reasons in the attached order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/12/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #8 Standing Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC, #5 MOTION for Order Directing Issuance of Notice of Arrest Order filed by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC, #4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian in lieu of United States Marshal filed by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC, #1 Complaint filed by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC, #7 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2019.(Velez, F.)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/27/2019. (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/27/2019. (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/27/2019. (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2019; Discovery due by 9/26/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/27/19. (Velez, F.)
March 27, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order Directing Issuance of Notice of Arrest Order by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Notice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nast, Timothy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian in lieu of United States Marshal by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Proposed Substitute Custodian, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nast, Timothy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Warrant), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nast, Timothy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC. (Nast, Timothy)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/Y NIPPER (O.N. 1098807) ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5210623.), filed by Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nast, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC v. M/Y Nipper (O.N. 1098807)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abruzese Yacht Sales, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Nast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y Nipper (O.N. 1098807)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?