Lahey Company, Inc. v. M/Y Madison Ann et al
Plaintiff: Lahey Company, Inc.
Defendant: M/Y Madison Ann and 65 Hatteras LRC, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00491
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *65 Hatteras LRC, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Colin B. Connor* *Russo & Rizio, LLC* *2507 Post Road, 1st Floor* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Velez, F.)
May 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 65 Hatteras LRC, LLC. (Connor, Colin)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to 65 Hatteras LRC, LLC, filed by Lahey Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C. Connor re: Request to Waive Service Unexecuted/Unreturned/Ignored by Def.)(Connor, Colin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lahey Company, Inc.. M/Y Madison Ann served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Connor, Colin)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *M/Y Madison Ann* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Colin B. Connor* *Russ & Associates, LLC* *2507 Post Road, 1st floor* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Velez, F.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lahey Company, Inc., #3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Substitute Custodian) filed by Lahey Company, Inc., #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Lahey Company, Inc., #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #6 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/2/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/2/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 4/3/2019 to correct file date (Velez, F.).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/2/2019. (Velez, F.) Modified on 4/3/2019 to correct file date (Velez, F.).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2019; Discovery due by 10/2/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2019.Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 2, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
April 2, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Madison Ann, M/Y. (Connor, Colin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Substitute Custodian) by Lahey Company, Inc. (Connor, Colin) Modified on 4/2/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lahey Company, Inc. (Connor, Colin) Modified on 4/2/2019 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint to Foreclose against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5219052.), filed by Lahey Company, Inc.(Connor, Colin) Modified on 4/2/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lahey Company, Inc. v. M/Y Madison Ann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y Madison Ann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 65 Hatteras LRC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lahey Company, Inc.
Represented By: Colin B. Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?