USA v. Knight
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Craig Knight
Case Number: 3:2019cv00494
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pipech, L.)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Approved. So ORDERED re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by USA. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/9/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by USA. (Sarnell, Bradley)
July 3, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/14/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 3, 2019 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/14/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties Rule 26(f) Report, after extension was due 6/30/2019. To date neither the report or a motion for extension of the deadline has been filed. The parties will file their report no later than 7/14/2019. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/3/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 29, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/30/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to 6/30/2019 to file the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/29/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2019 to File Rule 26(f) Report by Craig Knight. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Craig Knight.(Sklarz, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Craig Knight to 5/24/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 5/24/2019 to answer plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/10/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 24, 2019 Answer Complaint #1 Complaint by Craig Knight. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Craig Knight (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Craig Knight* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley Alexander Sarnell* *United States Dept of Justice, Tax Div -pob 55* *P.O. Box 55, Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 04/04/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 04/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 04/3/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2019. Discovery due by 10/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4-3-19.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 3, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 3, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Craig Knight. (Sarnell, Bradley)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craig Knight, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarnell, Bradley) Modified on 4/3/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Knight
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?