Solid 21, Inc. v. Breitling USA, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Solid 21, Inc.
Defendant: CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A., Breitling SA, Breitling AG and Breitling USA, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00514
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Attorney(s) Julia K. Whitelock to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-5761581) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Blatchley, Thomas)
March 19, 2020 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #75 MOTION for Attorney(s) RAYMOND J. MURO to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5757294) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Blatchley, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #74 MOTION for Attorney(s) RAYMOND J. MURO to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5757277) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Blatchley, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION for Attorney(s) RAYMOND J. MURO to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5757294) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in support of Motion pro hac)(Blatchley, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for Attorney(s) SAMUEL B. LAUGHLIN to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5757277) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Samuel B. Laughlin)(Blatchley, Thomas) Modified on 3/18/2020 to correct Attorney's name (Peterson, M).
March 17, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig J. Mariam on behalf of Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc (Mariam, Craig)
March 17, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 12/21/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2021; Joint Trial Brief due by 2/5/2021 (Johnson, D.)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. The parties' #71 joint motion to modify the scheduling order is GRANTED. The Court adopts the new deadlines proposed in the #71 motion, including that all discovery will be completed by December 21, 2020; dispositive motions are due January 21, 2021; and the joint trial memorandum is due on the later of February 5, 2021 or 30 days after the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/17/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
March 16, 2020 Filing 71 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Blatchley, Thomas)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. The defendants' #67 motion for Attorney Craig J. Mariam to be admitted pro hac vice is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/5/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
March 4, 2020 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #67 MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig J. Mariam to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5728377) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Blatchley, Thomas)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. The defendants' #66 motion to substitute counsel of record and to withdraw appearances is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to terminate the appearances of Attorneys Adam Marks, Richard Order, Jill Maria Pietrini, Michael Heimbold, Bejamin Aigboboh, and Paul Alexander Bost. Attorney Thomas Blatchley shall be listed as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/4/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
March 3, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig J. Mariam to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5728377) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blatchley, Thomas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and withdraw appearances by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Blatchley, Thomas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Blatchley on behalf of Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc (Blatchley, Thomas)
January 21, 2020 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/21/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2020; Joint Trial Brief due by 10/5/2020 (Johnson, D.)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. The parties' #63 joint motion to modify the scheduling order is GRANTED. The Court adopts the new deadlines proposed by the parties, including that all discovery will be completed by August 21, 2020; dispositive motions are due September 21, 2020; and the joint trial memorandum is due on the later of October 5, 2020 or thirty days after the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/21/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #55 Order SCHEDULING ORDER by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc.Responses due by 2/7/2020 (Order, Richard)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. In light of the parties' #61 joint status report, the telephonic status conference scheduled for January 15, 2020 is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/9/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 61 Joint STATUS REPORT by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc. (Order, Richard)
November 30, 2019 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew J. Lorin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5385009) by Solid 21, Inc.. (Lorin, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/1/2019. Signed by Clerk on 10/02/2019. (Peterson, M)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Plaintiff Solid 21 has filed a #56 notice of dismissal of Defendant CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A. ("Defendant CVC"). The notice of dismissal is proper under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Accordingly, all of Plaintiff Solid 21's claims in this action against Defendant CVC are DISMISSED. In addition, Defendant CVC's #36 motion to dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/12/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 9, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A. (CVC Capital) without prejudice by Solid 21, Inc. (Hecht, David)
August 7, 2019 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/22/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2020; Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2020; Joint Trial Brief due by 8/5/2020; Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/15/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' #53 Rule 26(f) Report and orders the deadlines set forth in the attached. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/7/2019. (Ram, Megha)
August 7, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Solid 21, Inc..(Hecht, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 53 Amended REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hecht, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael R. Heimbold to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5372178) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.. (Order, Richard)
August 2, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew J. Lorin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5385009) by Solid 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Louizos, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solid 21, Inc.. CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Hecht, David)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 07/25/2019. (Peterson, M)
July 25, 2019 Set Deadlines: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/6/2019. (Peterson, M)
July 24, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael R. Heimbold to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5372178) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Order, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The Court notes that Plaintiff Solid 21 and Defendant Breitling U.S.A. filed the #44 Rule 26(f) Report. The report states that "[t]here has been no meeting of counsel concerning [Defendants Breitling SA and CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.]." ECF No. 44 at 1. The Court will take no action on the #44 report at this time. Counsel of record shall confer and file a Rule 26(f) Report concerning all parties by August 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/23/2019. (Ram, Megha)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 07/22/2019. (Peterson, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solid 21, Inc.. Breitling AG served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019; Breitling SA served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Hecht, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 44 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hecht, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Yi Wen Wu to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5318159) by Solid 21, Inc.. (Wu, Yi Wen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin O. Aigboboh to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Order, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul A. Bost to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Order, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jill M. Pietrini to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Order, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Marks on behalf of Breitling AG, Breitling SA, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A. (Marks, Adam)
July 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Order on behalf of Breitling AG, Breitling SA, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A. (Order, Richard)
July 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure ot State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .(Responses due by 8/7/2019, ), or( Amended Complaint due by 8/7/2019) (Johnson, D.)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. Defendants have filed a #36 Motion to Dismiss. On or before August 7, 2019, Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which it pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendants' memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after August 7, 2019. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendants renew their motion to dismiss, Defendants may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/18/2019. (Ram, Megha)
July 17, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure ot State a Claim (), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () by CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A..Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Emanuela Brero, #3 Affidavit of Jill Pietrini, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Pietrini, Jill)
July 17, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Breitling SA.(Pietrini, Jill)
July 17, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jill M. Pietrini to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5310050) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.. (Pietrini, Jill)
July 17, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jill M. Pietrini to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5310050) by Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.. (Pietrini, Jill)
July 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Maria Pietrini on behalf of Breitling AG, Breitling SA, Breitling USA, Inc, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A. (Pietrini, Jill)
June 26, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Solid 21, Inc..(Hecht, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul A. Bost to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314607) by Breitling USA, Inc. (Bost, Paul)
June 18, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alexander Bost on behalf of Breitling USA, Inc (Bost, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/13/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/14/2019. (Peterson, M)
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Yi Wen Wu to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5318159) by Solid 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Louizos, John)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Amended Affidavit #25 . Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/12/2019. (Peterson, M)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 Amended AFFIDAVIT re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jill M. Pietrini to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5310050) Signed By Jill M. Pietrini, Esq. filed by Breitling USA, Inc. (Order, Richard)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin O. Aigboboh to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5310061) by Breitling USA, Inc. (Aigboboh, Benjamin)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin O. Aigboboh on behalf of Breitling USA, Inc (Aigboboh, Benjamin)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/12/2019. (Peterson, M)
June 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul A. Bost to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5314607) by Breitling USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(Order, Richard)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2019. (Peterson, M)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin O. Aigboboh to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5310061) by Breitling USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION)(Order, Richard)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jill M. Pietrini to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5310050) by Breitling USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JILL M. PIETRINI)(Order, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Marks on behalf of Breitling USA, Inc (Marks, Adam)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Solid 21, Inc. by Breitling USA, Inc.(Order, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Breitling USA, Inc. (Order, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Order on behalf of Breitling USA, Inc (Order, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solid 21, Inc.. Breitling USA, Inc served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Louizos, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #2 MOTION for Attorney(s) David L. Hecht to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5225839) by Solid 21, Inc.. (Hecht, David)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David L. Hecht. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 04/08/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Breitling AG, Breitling SA, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *John J. Louizos* *Curtis, Brinckerhoff & Barrett* *666 Summer St.* *Stamford, CT 06901-1416*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Breitling AG, Breitling SA, CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Louizos* *Curtis, Brinckerhoff & Barrett* *666 Summer St.* *Stamford, CT 06901-1416*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Breitling USA, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John J. Louizos* *Curtis, Brinckerhoff & Barrett* *666 Summer St.* *Stamford, CT 06901-1416*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Solid 21, Inc., #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 04/8/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/5/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/05/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2019. Discovery due by 10/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2019. Signed by Clerk on 04/5/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 5, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) David L. Hecht to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5225839) by Solid 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit David L. Hecht)(Louizos, John)
April 5, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Louizos, John)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5225728.), filed by Solid 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Louizos, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solid 21, Inc. v. Breitling USA, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVC Capital Partners SICAV-FIS S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breitling SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breitling AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breitling USA, Inc
Represented By: Paul Alexander Bost
Represented By: Adam B. Marks
Represented By: Richard S. Order
Represented By: Benjamin O. Aigboboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solid 21, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Louizos
Represented By: David Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?