USA v. Nievezquez Prod Inc
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Nievezquez Prod Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00516
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 7/26/2019. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. Signed by Clerk on 6/27/19. (Johnson, D.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Nievezquez Prod. Inc. by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Nash, Lauren)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Nievezquez Prod Inc served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Nash, Lauren)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Nievezquez Prod Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lauren M. Nash* *U.S. Attorney's Office-NH* *157 Church St., 25th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 04/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Nievezquez Prod Inc. (Nash, Lauren)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/05/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/05/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR-Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2019. Discovery due by 10/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2019. Signed by Clerk on 04/05/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) Modified on 4/8/2019 (Murphy, Tatihana).
April 5, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nievezquez Prod Inc, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nash, Lauren) Modified on 4/5/2019 to correct parties(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Nievezquez Prod Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nievezquez Prod Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Lauren M. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?