Parker v. Brinker International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher J Parker and Christopher J. Parker
Defendant: Brinker International Payroll Co., LP, Pepper Dining, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00517
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Christopher J. Parker SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/10/2019.(Lewis, D)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Christopher J. Parker (Sabatini, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pepper Dining, Inc. waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/9/2019 filed by Christopher J. Parker. (Sabatini, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brinker International, Inc. waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/9/2019 filed by Christopher J. Parker. (Sabatini, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brinker International Payroll Co., LP, Brinker International, Inc., Pepper Dining, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James V. Sabatini* *Sabatini & Associates* *One Market Square* *Newington, CT 06111*. (Reis, Julia)
May 15, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Brinker International Payroll Co., LP. (Sabatini, James)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher J. Parker, #5 Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/5/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/5/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/5/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2019 Discovery due by 10/5/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/5/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 5, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brinker International Payroll Co., LP, Brinker International, Inc., Pepper Dining, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5226193.), filed by Christopher J Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sabatini, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Brinker International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J Parker
Represented By: James V. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Parker
Represented By: James V. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker International Payroll Co., LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepper Dining, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?