USA v. Counterworks, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: The Counterworks, LLC, Counterworks, LLC and Duane Slavin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00519
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Motion for default judgment due by 7/25/2019. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/25/19. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to The Counterworks LLC and Duane Slavin by USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Nash, Lauren)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Counterworks, LLC served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Duane Slavin served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Return, #2 Supplemental Return)(Nash, Lauren)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter addressed to Lauren A. Nash (USAO) from David A. Scalzo Dated 04/22/19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope). (Barry, Donna)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Counterworks, LLC, Duane Slavin* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lauren M. Nash* *U.S. Attorney's Office-NH* *157 Church St., 25th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Counterworks, LLC, Duane Slavin. (Nash, Lauren)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2019. Discovery due by 10/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 5, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Counterworks, LLC, Duane Slavin filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nash, Lauren) Modified on 4/8/2019 to add party(Walker, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Counterworks, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Lauren M. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Lauren M. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Counterworks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counterworks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?