Zurich American Insurance Company v. Southern Connecticut Gas Company

Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Southern Connecticut Gas Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00534
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDER ON JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/10/2019.(Grossfeld, Eric)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. The Parties are to call Conference Number 888-278-0296 using Access Code 8077899 at the appointed time. (Grossfeld, Eric)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the Parties' Rule 26(f) Report. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Parties shall move to amend the pleadings or move to join additional parties by 7/26/2019. Discovery shall be completed by 5/1/2020. Dispositive motions (if the pending motion to dismiss is not granted), shall be filed on or before 6/1/2020. The Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed by 6/1/2020, unless dispositive motions are filed, in which case it shall be filed within 45 days of the Court's ruling thereon. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 a.m. The Parties are to call Conference Number 888-278-0296 using Access Code 8077899 at the appointed time. If the Parties want the Court to convene a Rule 16(b) conference, either in person or telephonically, they should notify chambers by email. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/10/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ringold, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Connecticut Gas Company identifying Corporate Parent Avangrid, Inc. for Southern Connecticut Gas Company. (Ringold, James)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Joint Report is overdue. It shall be filed on or before 7/11/2019 and shall include an explanation as to why it was not timely filed. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/1/2019.(Gould, K.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Southern Connecticut Gas Company.Responses due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (SCG Tariff), #3 Exhibit B (prior tariff excerpt))(Ringold, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles P. Reed on behalf of Southern Connecticut Gas Company (Reed, Charles)
May 29, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Southern Connecticut Gas Company to 7/5/2019. (Gould, K.)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting, on consent, #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to #1 Complaint due by 7/05/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/29/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/05/2019 (with consent) to plead in response to the #1 Complaint by Southern Connecticut Gas Company. (Ringold, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Mullen on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company (Mullen, Mark)
May 3, 2019 Terminated Certificate of Good Standing Deadline for Attorney Mark T. Mullen, Certificate of Good Standing Filed with Motion for Pro Hac Vice #12 . (Fanelle, N.)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark T. Mullen Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/2/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark T. Mullen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5262487) by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Blackburn, Stuart)
April 30, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Southern Connecticut Gas Company to 6/6/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to #1 Complaint due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/30/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric) Modified on 5/1/2019 to amend signature date (Gould, K.).
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/06/2019 to plead in response to the #1 Complaint by Southern Connecticut Gas Company. (Ringold, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Efrem Ringold on behalf of Southern Connecticut Gas Company (Ringold, James)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Southern Connecticut Gas Company served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Blackburn, Stuart)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Southern Connecticut Gas Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096* (Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2019. Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Blackburn, Stuart)
April 10, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 10, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Southern Connecticut Gas Company. (Blackburn, Stuart) Modified on 4/10/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Southern Connecticut Gas Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5231941.), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Blackburn, Stuart) Modified on 4/10/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Southern Connecticut Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Represented By: Mark T. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Connecticut Gas Company
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Represented By: Charles P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?