Clal Insurance Company Ltd., et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd. and Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Eyal Desheh, Sigurdur Olafsson, Deborah Griffin, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Yaacov Altman, Kare Schultz, Yitzhak Peterburg, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Allan Oberman, Maureen Cavanaugh, Erez Vigodman and Michael Mcclellan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00543
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Stay. Upon the occurrence of any of: (1) the dismissal of the Teva Securities Litigation, with prejudice, by this Court, and exhaustion of all appeals related thereto; or (2) the denial of any motion to dismiss the Teva Securities Litigation; or (3) either of the Parties to this action provides ten (10) day notice that they no longer consent to the voluntary stay of the Clal Litigation, then the Parties shall within twenty-one (21) days meet and confer and propose to the Court a schedule for further proceedings, including deadlines for the filing of any amendment to, or motion to dismiss or response to the Complaint, or a further deferment of or motion to stay proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/23/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 15, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Dahlstrom on behalf of Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dahlstrom, Patrick)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Attorney Patrick V. Dahlstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick V. Dahlstrom to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5279825) by Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Ferron, Margaret)
May 13, 2019 Filing 51 Joint MOTION to Stay Action by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman.Responses due by 6/3/2019 (O'Toole, Jill)
April 29, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Wernke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5248975) by Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd.. (Wernke, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wernke on behalf of Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd. (Wernke, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #41 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5248971) by Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd.. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 25, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A. Lieberman on behalf of Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 24, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5244011) by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman. (Hershman, Jordan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Hershman on behalf of Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman (Hershman, Jordan)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Attorney Michael J. Wernke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/23/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Wernke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5248975) by Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Comite, Erin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5248971) by Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Comite, Erin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Green Comite on behalf of Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd. (Comite, Erin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret B. Ferron on behalf of Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company, Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd., Clal Insurance Company Ltd., Clal Pension And Provident Ltd., Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd., Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd. (Ferron, Margaret)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2019. (Jaiman, R.)
April 18, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (O'Toole, Jill)
April 18, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (O'Toole, Jill)
April 18, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5244011) by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman. (O'Toole, Jill)
April 18, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman (O'Toole, Jill)
April 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE. Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/11/2019.(Oliver, T.)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/11/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2019 Discovery due by 10/11/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00530.
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT AND SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/4/2019. 4/5/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Transfer and [Proposed] Order by YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN. (SONNENFELD, MARC) Modified on 4/4/2019 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
April 1, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. YITZHAK PETERBURG waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. YAACOV ALTMAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. SIGURDUR OLAFSSON waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. MICHAEL MCCLELLAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. MAUREEN CAVANAUGH waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. KARE SCHULTZ waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. EYAL DESHEH waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. EREZ VIGODMAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. DEBORAH GRIFFIN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. ALLAN OBERMAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan D. Hershman, Esq. by YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13434719.). (SONNENFELD, MARC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. SONNENFELD on behalf of YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN with Certificate of Service(SONNENFELD, MARC)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD., ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD. re: Ron Stein served Summons and Complaint upon TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. by Personal Service. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (fdc, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL J. WERNKE, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #7 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/15/2019. 2/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Wernke by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13349550.). (KASKELA, DAVID)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS MATTER IN SUSPENSE PENDING DEFENDANTS FILING A MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/12/2019. 2/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #3 ); AND J. ALEXANDER HOOD II, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #4 ) ARE GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/12/2019. 2/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Alexander Hood II by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13344662.). (KASKELA, DAVID)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Lieberman by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13344621.). (KASKELA, DAVID)
February 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.. (ahf)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD..(ahf)
February 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN. 13 Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/7/2019 (ahf)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 192076.), filed by MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD., ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD..(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clal Insurance Company Ltd., et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clal Pension And Provident Ltd.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alumot Mutual Fund Management Company
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menorah Mivtachim Insurance Ltd.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clal Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atudot Pension Fund For Employees And Independent Workers Ltd.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menorah Mivtachim Pensions And Gemel Ltd.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Griffin
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaacov Altman
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kare Schultz
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yitzhak Peterburg
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dipankar Bhattacharjee
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Oberman
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mcclellan
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?