Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund et al v. DT&S Trucking, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund and Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund
Defendant: David Sekelsky, DT&S Trucking, LLC, T&S Pool Water, LLC and Terry Sekelsky
Case Number: 3:2019cv00546
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Campora, Gregory)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/31/2019. (Lewis, D)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund filed by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund. (Campora, Gregory)
May 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/3/2019 (Lewis, D)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by DT&S Trucking, LLC, David Sekelsky, Terry Sekelsky, T&S Pool Water, LLC. (Barry, Donna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Korolyshun on behalf of DT&S Trucking, LLC, David Sekelsky, Terry Sekelsky and T&S Pool Water, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Barry, Donna)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the court should not dismiss this case for failure to prosecute as a result of the plaintiffs failure to move for a default entry against the defendants. Plaintiff should file its response by May 29, 2019. Failure to respond by said date may result in the dismissal of this case. Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2019 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/15/2019.(Lewis, D)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund. David Sekelsky served on 4/20/2019, answer due 5/11/2019. (Campora, Gregory)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund. Terry Sekelsky served on 4/20/2019, answer due 5/11/2019. (Campora, Gregory)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund. T&S Pool Water, LLC served on 4/20/2019, answer due 5/11/2019. (Campora, Gregory)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund. DT&S Trucking, LLC served on 4/20/2019, answer due 5/11/2019. (Campora, Gregory)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *DT&S Trucking, LLC, David Sekelsky, Terry Sekelsky, T&S Pool Water, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory S. Campora* *Robert M. Cheverie & Associates* *333 East River Drive, Suite 101* *East Hartford, CT 06108*. (Anastasio, F.)
April 15, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to DT&S Trucking, LLC, David Sekelsky, Terry Sekelsky, T&S Pool Water, LLC. (Campora, Gregory)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint,, filed by Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund, I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, #5 Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2019 Discovery due by 10/12/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DT&S Trucking, LLC, David Sekelsky, T&S Pool Water, LLC, Terry Sekelsky ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5235140.), filed by I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund, Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund.(Campora, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund et al v. DT&S Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local No. 478 Health Benefits Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.U.O.E. Local Union No. 478
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 478 Training and Skill Improvement Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Supplemental Unemployment Benefits Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the I.U.O.E. Local 478 Pension Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sekelsky
Represented By: Richard J. Korolyshun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DT&S Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Korolyshun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&S Pool Water, LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Korolyshun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Sekelsky
Represented By: Richard J. Korolyshun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?