Burns v. Rovella et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Burns
Defendant: Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Jay Delgrosso, George Battle, Mathieu R. Asselin, Alain J Bisson, James C. Rovella, Stavros J. Mellekas, Michael B. Darcy and Dora B. Schriro
Case Number: 3:2019cv00553
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 8/9/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2019. (Lewis, D)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss until August 9, 2019 by Christopher Burns. (Brewer, James)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part #22 MOTION to Stay re #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Mathieu R. Asselin, George Battle, Alain J Bisson, Michael B. Darcy, Jay Delgrosso, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Stavros J. Mellekas, James C. Rovella, Dora B. Schriro. The parties may propound written discovery. However, depositions are stayed until the court rules on defendants Motion to Dismiss. There does not appear to be a pressing reason to preserve testimony, e.g., imminent death of a key witness. The plaintiff seeks deposition discovery, which can await a ruling, as well as paper discovery. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/28/2019. (DeRubeis, B.)
June 27, 2019 Security for Cost in the amount of $500 posted by Christopher Burns. Receipt Number CTXN00019499. (Reis, Julia)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #22 MOTION to Stay re #21 MOTION to Dismiss and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause Order filed by Mathieu R. Asselin, George Battle, Alain J Bisson, Michael B. Darcy, Jay Delgrosso, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Stavros J. Mellekas, James C. Rovella, Dora B. Schriro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Ennis, Carolyn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO 24 Order to Show Cause, by Christopher Burns filed by Christopher Burns. (Brewer, James)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why the court should not grant the Motion to Stay, in part, allowing papers discovery (interrogatories, requests for production, requests for answers) to go forward, but no depositions. Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2019 SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/24/2019.(Lewis, D)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher Burns. (Brewer, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay re #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Mathieu R. Asselin, George Battle, Alain J Bisson, Michael B. Darcy, Jay Delgrosso, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Stavros J. Mellekas, James C. Rovella, Dora B. Schriro.Responses due by 7/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery)(Ennis, Carolyn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Mathieu R. Asselin, George Battle, Alain J Bisson, Michael B. Darcy, Jay Delgrosso, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Stavros J. Mellekas, James C. Rovella, Dora B. Schriro.Responses due by 7/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Ennis, Carolyn)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management Plan Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2019. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2020. Status Report due by 9/17/2019. Trial Brief due by 5/30/2020. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/17/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/11/2019. (Lewis, D)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ennis, Carolyn)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 12, 2019 to file Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/24/2019. (Lewis, D)
May 24, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Mathieu R. Asselin to 7/12/2019; George Battle to 7/12/2019; Alain J Bisson to 7/12/2019; Michael B. Darcy to 7/12/2019; Jay Delgrosso to 7/12/2019; Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection to 7/12/2019; Stavros J. Mellekas to 7/12/2019; James C. Rovella to 7/12/2019; Dora B. Schriro to 7/12/2019. (Lewis, D)
May 22, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/24/2019 (Lewis, D)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 12, 2019 to file Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint by Mathieu R. Asselin, George Battle, Alain J Bisson, Michael B. Darcy, Jay Delgrosso, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Stavros J. Mellekas, James C. Rovella, Dora B. Schriro. (Ennis, Carolyn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Security for Costs by Mathieu R. Asselin, George Battle, Alain J Bisson, Michael B. Darcy, Jay Delgrosso, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Stavros J. Mellekas, James C. Rovella, Dora B. Schriro. (Ennis, Carolyn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Ennis on behalf of Mathieu R. Asselin, George Battle, Alain J Bisson, Michael B. Darcy, Jay Delgrosso, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Stavros J. Mellekas, James C. Rovella, Dora B. Schriro IN THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND OFFICIAL CAPACITIES (Ennis, Carolyn)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dora B. Schriro waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 filed by Christopher Burns. (Brewer, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Burns. Mathieu R. Asselin served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019; George Battle served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019; Alain J Bisson served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019; Michael B. Darcy served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019; Jay Delgrosso served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019; Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Stavros J. Mellekas served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019; James C. Rovella served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Brewer, James)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH ATTACHED INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS WHICH ARE IN EFFECT FOR THIS CASE. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/19/2019.(Lewis, D)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE re #9 Notice (Other): The Initial Discovery Protocols do apply to this case, which includes claims of First Amendment Retaliation and 14th Amendment Due Process, and state intentional infliction of emotional distress. See Notice to Parties (Doc. No. #6 ) at Paragraph 2 (B). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/19/2019.(Lewis, D)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Christopher Burns initial discovery protocols do not apply (Brewer, James)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mathieu R. Asselin, George Battle, Alain J Bisson, Michael B. Darcy, Jay Delgrosso, Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, Stavros J. Mellekas, James C. Rovella, Dora B. Schriro* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James S. Brewer* *James S. Brewer, Attorney at Law* *67 Russ St.* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Burns, #5 Order Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2019 Discovery due by 10/12/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5235789.), filed by Christopher Burns.(Brewer, James)
April 12, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
April 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Brewer, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Rovella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Delgrosso
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Battle
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathieu R. Asselin
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alain J Bisson
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Rovella
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stavros J. Mellekas
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Darcy
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora B. Schriro
Represented By: Carolyn Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Burns
Represented By: James S. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?