Arnold v. Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation
Plaintiff: Eleanor Arnold
Defendant: Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00560
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation to 7/12/2019. (Ferguson, L.)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby GRANTED up to and including 7/12/2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/20/2019. (Patel, R.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 12, 2019 to file responsive Pleading #1 Complaint by Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation. (Fennelly, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Edward Fennelly, III on behalf of Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation (Fennelly, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Ciottone on behalf of Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation (Ciottone, Jonathan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert W. Folchetti* *Klein & Folchetti, P.C.* *50 Main Street* *Brewster, NY 10509*. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 15, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation. (Folchetti, Robert)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Eleanor Arnold, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/15/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/15/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2019, Discovery due by 10/15/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/15/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 15, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5237521.), filed by Eleanor Arnold.(Folchetti, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Arnold
Represented By: Robert W. Folchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramapoo Restaurant Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan P. Ciottone
Represented By: Richard Edward Fennelly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?