Tulipani v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Melissa Tulipani
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00565
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Social Security Transcripts by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Pollack, Kathryn)
June 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Melissa Tulipani Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Yelner, Olia)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 5/29/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Pollack on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Pollack, Kathryn)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without prepayment of fees, costs or security therefor, which includes an affidavit regarding her current financial circumstances. See Doc. #4 -1. In plaintiff's motion, she states that she has been unemployed since 2009, and that her spouse is currently unemployed. See id. at 3. Plaintiff and her spouse live with plaintiff's mother. See id. at 4. Plaintiff has limited assets, and supports herself through the receipt of non-cash government benefits, and financial assistance from her mother. See id. at 3-5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Court also terminates plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as MOOT. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 4/17/19. (Dowie, C)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Tulipani. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Yelner, Olia)
April 15, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Nancy A. Berryhill to 6/14/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 4/16/2019 to correct judge (Fazekas, J.).
April 15, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Oliver, T.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Tulipani. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Yelner, Olia) Modified on 4/16/2019 (Walker, A).
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, Social Security Administration, filed by Melissa Tulipani.(Yelner, Olia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tulipani v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Kathryn Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Tulipani
Represented By: Olia Yelner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?