Barnes v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Ronald Barnes
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00570
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Government having filed its administrative record (Doc. No. 7), the court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order:Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand, supporting memorandum of law, and statement of material facts on or before August 19, 2019. Defendant shall file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand, supporting memorandum of law, and statement of material facts on or before October 18, 2019. Plaintiff may file a reply brief pursuant to Local Rule 7(d) on or before November 1, 2019. Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, counsel are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate. The court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Scheduling Order which sets forth page limits, form and content requirements for motions, supporting memoranda, and statement of material facts (Doc. No. 4.) The parties should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion.Requests for extensions of these deadlines are discouraged and, unless unusual circumstances dictate otherwise, counsel should not seek an extension of greater than 30 days. Any motion for extension of a deadline must include a showing of good cause as required by Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three days before the existing deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2019 Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/21/19. (Caldero, M.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanny Santana on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Santana, Johanny)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Transcripts by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Santana, Johanny)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without prepayment of fees, costs or security therefor, which includes an affidavit regarding his current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 -1. In plaintiff's motion, he states that he has been unemployed since 2011. See id. at 3. Plaintiff has limited assets, no cash on hand, and is supported by his girlfriend, who he lives with, and who earns a modest income. See id. at 3-5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 4/17/19. (Dowie, C)
April 16, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Nancy A. Berryhill to 6/17/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Anastasio, F.)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Yelner, Olia)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, Social Security Administration, filed by Ronald Barnes.(Yelner, Olia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Johanny Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Barnes
Represented By: Olia Yelner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?