Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds et al v. Urban Contractors of CT, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund and Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund
Defendant: Urban Contractors of CT, LLC and Elmar Shakir
Case Number: 3:2019cv00571
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Default entered pursuant to Rule 55(a)FRCP. Motion for default judgment due by 7/24/2019. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 6/24/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Urban Contractors of CT, LLC and Elmar Shakir by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund. (Gould, Nancy)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund. Elmar Shakir served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Urban Contractors of CT, LLC served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Gould, Nancy)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Elmar Shakir, Urban Contractors of CT, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nancy Ellen Gould* *Gould Killian LLP* *280 Trumbull St., 21st Fl.* *Hartford, CT 06447*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2019. Discovery due by 10/16/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
April 16, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Elmar Shakir, Urban Contractors of CT, LLC. (Gould, Nancy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elmar Shakir, Urban Contractors of CT, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5240666.), filed by Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds, Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund, Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund.(Gould, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds et al v. Urban Contractors of CT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Health Benefits Funds
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New England Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Southern New England Carpenters Annuity Fund
Represented By: Nancy Ellen Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Contractors of CT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmar Shakir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?