Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co et al v. Country Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co and UTICA Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Interested Party: Gloria Capozzi, Magenic Real Estate Services, LLC, Orchard Hills LLC and Herman Capozzi
Case Number: 3:2019cv00585
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management Plan Amended Pleadings due by 9/2/2019. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2020. Status Report due by 9/27/2019. Trial Brief due by 2/15/2020. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/27/2019.(Reis, Julia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John M O'Donnell on behalf of Orchard Hills LLC (O'Donnell, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara O'Donnell on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co (O'Donnell, Barbara)
June 17, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses. by Country Mutual Insurance Company.(Adams, Kathleen)
May 22, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Country Mutual Insurance Company to 6/17/2019. (Lewis, D)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 17, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #17 Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/22/2019. (Lewis, D)
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 17, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #17 Amended Complaint, by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Adams, Kathleen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige D. Beisner on behalf of UTICA Mutual Insurance Company (Beisner, Paige)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele C. Wojcik on behalf of UTICA Mutual Insurance Company (Wojcik, Michele)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly B. Gaertner on behalf of Magenic Real Estate Services, LLC (Gaertner, Kelly)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Country Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Henlin, Alexander)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Herman Capozzi waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. (Henlin, Alexander)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Orchard Hills LLC waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. (Henlin, Alexander)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Magenic Real Estate Services, LLC waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. (Henlin, Alexander)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gloria Capozzi waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. (Henlin, Alexander)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Benjamin Hasbani on behalf of Herman Capozzi (Hasbani, Jonathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co. Country Mutual Insurance Company served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Henlin, Alexander)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Adams, Kathleen)
May 9, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/24/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen F. Adams on behalf of Country Mutual Insurance Company (Adams, Kathleen)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Country Mutual Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexander G. Henlin* *Sulloway & Hollis, P.L.L.C.* *9 Capitol Street* *Concord, NH 03301*. (Reis, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Henlin, Alexander)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co, #6 Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/19/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/19/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/19/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2019 Discovery due by 10/19/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/23/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
April 19, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Walker, A)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Henlin, Alexander)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5244183.), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henlin, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co et al v. Country Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co
Represented By: Alexander G. Henlin
Represented By: Barbara O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTICA Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Paige D. Beisner
Represented By: Michele C. Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gloria Capozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Magenic Real Estate Services, LLC
Represented By: Kelly B. Gaertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Orchard Hills LLC
Represented By: John M O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Herman Capozzi
Represented By: Jonathan Benjamin Hasbani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen F. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?