Highfields Capital I LP, et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Highfields Capital III L.P., Highfields Capital I LP and Highfields Capital II LP
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Sigurdur Olafsson, Deborah Griffin, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman and Allan Oberman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00603
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Stay. Upon the occurrence of any of: (1) the dismissal of the Teva Securities Litigation, with prejudice, by this Court, and exhaustion of all appeals related thereto; or (2) the denial of any motion to dismiss the Teva Securities Litigation; or (3) either of the Parties to this action provides ten (10) day notice that they no longer consent to the voluntary stay of the Highfields Litigation, then the Parties shall within twenty-one (21) days meet and confer and propose to the Court a schedule for further proceedings, including deadlines for the filing of any amendment to, or motion to dismiss or response to the Complaint, or a further deferment of or motion to stay proceedings, with deadlines in the Parties prior agreed stipulation dated April 17, 2019 (ECF Nos. 6 & 7) to presumptively control. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/23/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Stay Action by Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman.Responses due by 5/31/2019 (O'Toole, Jill)
May 8, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sigurdur Olafsson waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Eyal Desheh waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Deborah Griffin waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Erez Vigodman waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Maureen Cavanaugh waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; Allan Oberman waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 filed by Highfields Capital I LP; Highfields Capital II LP; Highfields Capital III L.P.. (Hoffman, Ari)
May 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari J. Hoffman on behalf of Highfields Capital I LP, Highfields Capital II LP, Highfields Capital III L.P. (Hoffman, Ari)
May 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Ball on behalf of Highfields Capital I LP, Highfields Capital II LP, Highfields Capital III L.P. (Ball, David)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/1/2019.(Jaiman, R.)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/29/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 25, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5250578) by Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman. (Hershman, Jordan)
April 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Hershman on behalf of Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman (Hershman, Jordan)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Attorney Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2019. (Reis, Julia)
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (O'Toole, Jill)
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5250578) by Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman. (O'Toole, Jill)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman (O'Toole, Jill)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel in Transferred Case. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2019 Discovery due by 10/19/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 11/23/2019 Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00569. Modified on 4/23/2019 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT, AND SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/17/2019. 4/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Transfer and [Proposed] Order by MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., EREZ VIGODMAN. (SONNENFELD, MARC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW H. HAVERSTICK on behalf of HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL I LP, HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL II LP, HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL III L.P. with Jury Demand(HAVERSTICK, MATTHEW)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS MATTER IN SUSPENSE PENDING DEFENDANTS FILING A MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/12/2019. 2/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE TO HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AS RELATED TO THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY LTD. V. THE PHOENIX PENSION LTD., et al., CIVIL ACTION NO.: 18-cv-3305. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/11/2019. 2/12/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
February 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL I LP, HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL II LP, HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL III L.P.. (jwl, )
February 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., EREZ VIGODMAN. Seven Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/11/19 (jwl, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL I LP, HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL II LP, HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL III L.P..(jwl, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., EREZ VIGODMAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 192218.), filed by HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL II LP, HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL I LP, HIGHFIELDS CAPITAL III L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highfields Capital I LP, et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highfields Capital III L.P.
Represented By: Ari J. Hoffman
Represented By: David A. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highfields Capital I LP
Represented By: Ari J. Hoffman
Represented By: David A. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highfields Capital II LP
Represented By: Ari J. Hoffman
Represented By: David A. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Griffin
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Oberman
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?