VFW Post #5446 v. AIX Specialty Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: VFW Post #5446
Defendant: AIX Specialty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00605
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gould, K.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by AIX Specialty Insurance Co.. (Malloy, John)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against VFW Post #5446 by AIX Specialty Insurance Co..(Malloy, John)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AIX Specialty Insurance Co., #3 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by AIX Specialty Insurance Co., #10 Standing Protective Order, #5 Certificate of Service filed by AIX Specialty Insurance Co., #9 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by John Peter Malloy on behalf of AIX Specialty Insurance Co., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by AIX Specialty Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
April 24, 2019 Answer deadline updated for AIX Specialty Insurance Co. to 5/7/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/24/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 7, 2019 Respond to Complaint by AIX Specialty Insurance Co.. (Malloy, John)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/22/2019. Discovery due by 10/23/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/27/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
April 23, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AIX Specialty Insurance Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice (Other), #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Malloy, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIX Specialty Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for AIX Specialty Insurance Co.. (Malloy, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by AIX Specialty Insurance Co. re No Pending Motions (Malloy, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Peter Malloy on behalf of AIX Specialty Insurance Co. (Malloy, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AIX Specialty Insurance Co. from Superior Court of Connecticut, case number WWM-CV19-6016854-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5248980, filed by AIX Specialty Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons)(Malloy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VFW Post #5446 v. AIX Specialty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VFW Post #5446
Represented By: T.J. Morelli-Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIX Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: John Peter Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?