In re: McClean
Appellant: Edson McClean and Angela McClean
Not Yet Classified: US Trustee
In Re: Edson S McClean and Angela E McClean
Appellee: Roberta Napolitano
Case Number: 3:2019cv00625
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re 7 Order, filed by Angela McClean, Edson McClean. (Reis, Julia)
May 12, 2019 Filing 8 No Designation/Agreed Statement Filed: 19-625(MPS)(RE:) 50 Notice of Appeal to District Court Filed by Angela E. McClean, Edson S. McClean, Debtors. 47 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case. Appellant Designation or Agreed Statement due by 5/8/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The appellee has filed a #6 motion to dismiss the appeal for failure to timely comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(a)(1). That rule requires that the appellants file with the bankruptcy clerk and serve on the appellee a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented. Appellants shall file a response to the motion to dismiss within 21 days. Failure to file a response by the deadline will result in the motion being decided without input from appellants, and possibly dismissal of the appeal. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order and the #6 motion to appellants.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/10/2019.(Barclay, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss (), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution () by Roberta Napolitano.Responses due by 5/30/2019 (Crook, Patrick)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Crook on behalf of Roberta Napolitano (Crook, Patrick)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2019: #1 Transmittal Email) (Fanelle, N.).
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 18-30796, filed by Edson McClean, Angela McClean. (Attachments: #1 Order #47)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: McClean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edson McClean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Angela McClean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Edson S McClean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Angela E McClean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Roberta Napolitano
Represented By: Patrick Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?