Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00642
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/2/19. (Hall, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until after the parties hold a conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and agree on a new pretrial schedule Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/23/19. (Hall, Gregory)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC of Related Cases (Conway, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 complaint and exhibits) (Bozek, M.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC, and #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019.(Bozek, M.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/30/2019.(Bozek, M.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2019. Discovery due by 10/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019.(Bozek, M.)
April 30, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Anastasio, F.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5257150.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?