Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00643
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time and to amend the pre-trial deadlines. The parties must hold a Rule 26(f) conference within 30 days of an appearance of counsel on behalf of the defendant and the parties must file a Rule 26(f) report within 14 days of that conference. The deadline to amend the pleadings will now be within 60 days of the Rule 26(f) conference. The Court will set further pre-trial deadlines upon review of the parties' Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/2/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until after the parties hold a conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and agree on a new pretrial schedule Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/23/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC of Related Cases (Conway, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 Report on the 4/30/2019 of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Velez, F.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/30/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/30/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/30/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2019; Discovery due by 10/30/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019. (Velez, F.)
April 30, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5257159.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?