Migdal Insurance Company LTD et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD et al
Plaintiff: Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD, Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD and Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Eyal Desheh, Maureen Cavanaugh, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries LTD, Michael Mcclellan, Deborah Griffin, Yaacov Altman, Yitzhak Peterburg, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Erez Vigodman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Kare Schultz, Allan Oberman and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00655
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Stay. Upon the occurrence of any of: (1) the dismissal of the Teva Securities Litigation, with prejudice, by this Court, and exhaustion of all appeals related thereto; or (2) the denial of any motion to dismiss the Teva Securities Litigation; or (3) either of the Parties to this action provides ten (10) day notice that they no longer consent to the voluntary stay of the Migdal Litigation, then the Parties shall within twenty-one (21) days meet and confer and propose to the Court a schedule for further proceedings, including deadlines for the filing of any amendment to, or motion to dismiss or response to the Complaint, or a further deferment of or motion to stay proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/14/2019. (Kaas, E.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Stay Action by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman.Responses due by 6/28/2019 (O'Toole, Jill)
May 31, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5290391) by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman. (Hershman, Jordan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Hershman on behalf of Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman (Hershman, Jordan)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Attorney Jordan D. Hershman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/22/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (O'Toole, Jill)
May 22, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. (O'Toole, Jill)
May 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan D. Hershman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5290391) by Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman. (O'Toole, Jill)
May 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. O'Toole on behalf of Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman (O'Toole, Jill)
May 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Dahlstrom on behalf of Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dahlstrom, Patrick)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Attorney Patrick V. Dahlstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2019. (Oliver, T.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick V. Dahlstrom to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5279840) by Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Ferron, Margaret)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5271379) by Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A. Lieberman on behalf of Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Wernke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5271389) by Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD. (Wernke, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wernke on behalf of Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD (Wernke, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Wernke. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/9/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Wernke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5271389) by Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Ferron, Margaret)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeremy A. Lieberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5271379) by Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Ferron, Margaret)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/8/2019.(Jaiman, R.)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R Underhill for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/6/19.(Johnson, D.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yaacov Altman, Dipankar Bhattacharjee, Maureen Cavanaugh, Eyal Desheh, Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Allan Oberman, Sigurdur Olafsson, Yitzhak Peterburg, Kare Schultz, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Erez Vigodman* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erin Green Comite* *Scott & Scott LLP - CT, 156 South Main Street* *P. O. Box 192* *Colchester, CT 06415*. (Agati, Kathryn)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint,, filed by Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, and #6 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret B. Ferron on behalf of Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD (Ferron, Margaret)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD, Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD. (Comite, Erin)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/30/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/30/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2019, Discovery due by 10/30/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019.(Agati, Kathryn)
April 30, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
April 30, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Comite, Erin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number CCTDC-5259374.), filed by Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD, Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD., Migdal Insurance Company LTD, Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD, Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD., Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD., Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Comite, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Migdal Insurance Company LTD et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Cavanaugh
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mcclellan
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Griffin
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaacov Altman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yitzhak Peterburg
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dipankar Bhattacharjee
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kare Schultz
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Oberman
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yozma Pension Fund of Self Employed LTD
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altshuler Shaham Mutual Funds Management LTD.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Fund of the Employees of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem LTD
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdal Makefet Pension and Provident Funds LTD.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdal Insurance Company LTD
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halman Aldubi Provident and Pension Funds LTD
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altshuler Shaham Provident Funds and Pension LTD.
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?