Stone v. Community Health Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ralph B. Stone
Defendant: Ablan H. Berko and Community Health Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00662
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before : 7/9/2019, (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019.(Perez, J.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc..Responses due by 7/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Green, Brenda)
May 8, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to 6/22/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 6/22/2019. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/8/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 22, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead #1 Notice of Removal, by Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc.. (Green, Brenda)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc., #3 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Brenda M. Green on behalf of Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc., #6 Standing Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2019. Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, of No Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Green, Brenda)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda M. Green on behalf of Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc. (Green, Brenda)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc. from Middletown Superior Court, case number MMX-CV-19-6024006-S., filed by Ablan H. Berko, Community Health Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Green, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Community Health Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph B. Stone
Represented By: Penn Rhodeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ablan H. Berko
Represented By: Brenda M. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda M. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?