Mohan v. UBS Financial Services Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mark L. Mohan
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc. and UBS AG
Case Number: 3:2019cv00663
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UBS Financial Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc for UBS Financial Services Inc.. (Jacques, Bernard)
June 12, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UBS AG identifying Corporate Parent UBS Group AG for UBS AG. (Jacques, Bernard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Nudelman on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc. (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) (Nudelman, Sarah)
June 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin DeCamp on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc. (Admitted Pro Hac Vice) (DeCamp, Justin)
June 4, 2019 Answer deadline updated for UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc. to 7/29/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION (Doc. #20 ). The Court APPROVES the parties' stipulation. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/4/2019.(Gutierrez, Y.)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Attorney Sarah Elise Nudelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/3/2019. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/04/19. (Barry, Donna)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Attorney Justin J. DeCamp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/3/2019. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/04/19. (Barry, Donna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah Elise Nudelman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5303672) by UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc.. (Jacques, Bernard)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin J. DeCamp to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5303658) by UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc.. (Jacques, Bernard)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Waiver of Service and Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint by UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc.. (Jacques, Bernard)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard E. Jacques on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc. (Jacques, Bernard)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Mark L. Mohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidence from ALJ hearing - Ins. Payments, #2 Exhibit Mohan - Aetna Benefit Plan)(Mohan, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark L. Mohan re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Mohan, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark L. Mohan re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(Mohan, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark L. Mohan re #10 Amended Complaint (Mohan, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark L. Mohan re #1 Complaint, (Mohan, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Mohan (Mohan, Mark)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/21/19.(Pesta, J.)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/21/19. (Pesta, J.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UBS AG and UBS Financial Services Inc., filed by Mark L. Mohan. (Barry, Donna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Mark L. Mohan. (Barry, Donna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Consent to Electronic Notice by Mark L. Mohan. (Barry, Donna)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/6/2019.(Gould, K.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Mark L. Mohan, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 05/03/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/02/19. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Barry, Donna)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/02/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/02/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019, Discovery due by 11/1/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/02/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 2, 2019 Filing fee received from Mark Mohan: $ 400.00, receipt number 153308. (Barry, Donna)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UBS AG and UBS Financial Services Inc., filed by Mark L. Mohan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C) (Barry, Donna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barry, Donna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohan v. UBS Financial Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark L. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Bernard E. Jacques
Represented By: Sarah Nudelman
Represented By: Justin DeCamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Represented By: Bernard E. Jacques
Represented By: Sarah Nudelman
Represented By: Justin DeCamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?