Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP et al
Plaintiff: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Defendant: Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP, Webster Bank, National Association and Macton Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00665
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #20 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co..(Marcus, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert R. Marcus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5311395) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Marcus, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Webster Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Webster Financial Corporation for Webster Bank, National Association. (McEleney, Kevin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Webster Bank, National Association.(McEleney, Kevin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Marcus on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Marcus, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/11/2019. (Gould, K.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. by Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP.(Pylman, Jacob)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert R. Marcus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5311395) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Marshall, Gregory)
May 28, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Webster Bank, National Association to 6/18/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Webster Bank, National Association shall respond to #1 Complaint by 6/18/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/28/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Gugliotti on behalf of Webster Bank, National Association (Gugliotti, Thomas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 18, 2019 to Plead #1 Complaint, by Webster Bank, National Association. (McEleney, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Joseph McEleney on behalf of Webster Bank, National Association (McEleney, Kevin)
May 24, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP to 6/10/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting, on consent, #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP shall respond to #1 Complaint by 6/10/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/24/2019. (Grossfeld, Eric)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 10, 2019 to File an Answer or Motion Directed to the Complaint by Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP. (Pylman, Jacob)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Pylman on behalf of Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP (Pylman, Jacob)
May 23, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP to 5/27/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Lincoln's Disclosures, Order re Disclosures served on Webster Bank National Association and Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III on 5/8/2019 and 5/6/2019, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Service on Webster, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Service on Congruent)(Marshall, Gregory)
May 17, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Macton Corporation to 5/27/2019; Webster Bank, National Association to 5/28/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Lincoln's Disclosures, Order re Disclosures served on Macton Corporation and Webster Bank National Association on 5/6/2019 and 5/7/2019, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Macton Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Webster Service)(Marshall, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Webster Bank, National Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory Marshall* *Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP* *1615 L Street NW, Suite 1350 Washington, Suite 1350* *Washington, DC 20036*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Macton Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory Marshall* *Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP* *1615 L Street NW, Suite 1350 Washington, Suite 1350* *Washington, DC 20036*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory Marshall* *Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP* *1615 L Street NW, Suite 1350 Washington, Suite 1350* *Washington, DC 20036*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co., #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2019. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 2, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Marshall, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Webster Bank, National Association. (Marshall, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Macton Corporation. (Marshall, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP. (Marshall, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP, Macton Corporation, Webster Bank, National Association ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5262641.), filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Coversheet)(Marshall, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Gregory Marshall
Represented By: Robert Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congruent Credit Opportunities Fund III, LP
Represented By: Jacob Pylman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster Bank, National Association
Represented By: Thomas A. Gugliotti
Represented By: Kevin Joseph McEleney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?