Bankers Standard Insurance Co. v. Ford

Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Co
Defendant: David M. Ford
Case Number: 3:2019cv00670
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #1 Complaint, Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Appointment of Umpire and In Opposition to Respondent's Cross-Motion for Appointment of Umpire by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Laurie, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT AND EXHIBITS 1-9 by David M. Ford re #9 Objection re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)(Biller, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION re #1 Complaint, APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF APPRAISAL UMPIRE AND CROSS-MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF UMPIRE filed by David M. Ford. (Biller, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon David Biller on behalf of David M. Ford (Biller, Jon)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Expedite re #1 Complaint, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Laurie, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite re #1 Complaint, by Bankers Standard Insurance Co. (Laurie, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Co, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2019. Discovery due by 11/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/03/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Application for Appointment of Appraisal Umpire against David M. Ford ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5264370.), filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Laurie, Robert)
May 2, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankers Standard Insurance Co. v. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Ford
Represented By: Jon David Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?