Ignacuinos v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticas Inc
Plaintiff: Carl Ignacuinos
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticas Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00672
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Ignacuinos. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticas Inc served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Lee, C.K.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticas Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephen M. Bourtin, The Boyd Law Group* *68 Southfield Avenue* *Two Stamford Landing* *Stamford, CT 06902*. (Oliver, T.)
June 11, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Lee, C.K.)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney C.K. Lee. Signed by Clerk on 5/9/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) C.K. Lee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-5270831) by Carl Ignacuinos. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of C.K. Lee with Certificates of Good Standing)(Bourtin, Stephen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carl Ignacuinos.(Bourtin, Stephen)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Carl Ignacuinos Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2019. Discovery due by 11/2/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 3, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5264625.), filed by Carl Ignacuinos.(Bourtin, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ignacuinos v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Ignacuinos
Represented By: Stephen M. Bourtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?