U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Grant
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A. Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Andrew D. Grant
Case Number: 3:2019cv00685
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of New Britain. (Ferguson, L.)
June 12, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ferguson, L.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Motion to be Heard by the U.S. District Court (ECF No. #23 ) is hereby DENIED. See ECF No. #24 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time until 30 days for delivering the case files (ECF No. #22 ) is hereby DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Motion for the Federal Court to Notice the Superior Court of New Britain, Connecticut to Cease and Desist with all Court Activities Pertaining to my Case Docket Number HHBCV186041375 (ECF No. #19 ) is hereby DENIED. See ECF No. #24 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached document, Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Improperly Removed Case (ECF No. #8 ) is hereby GRANTED. This case is hereby remanded to Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New Britain at New Britain. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/12/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 Motions to be Heard by the U.S. District Court by Andrew D. Grant. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 State Court docket sheet, #2 Transcript Requests)(Agati, Kathryn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days for delivering the case files by Andrew D. Grant. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Andrew D. Grant* *P.O. Box 27-1678* *West Hartford, CT 06127*. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 Retraction: Regarding Summons in a Civil Action Delivered to the Court on June 6, 2019 by Andrew D. Grant (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Agati, Kathryn)
June 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Agati, Kathryn) Modified on 6/10/2019 to correct filing date (Agati, Kathryn).
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for the Federal Court to Notice the Superior Court of New Britain, Connecticut to Cease and Desist with all Court Activities Pertaining to my Case Docket Number HHBCV186041375 by Andrew D. Grant. Responses due by 6/27/2019 (Agati, Kathryn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 Complaint: Regarding Late Noticing Regarding Critical Court Date by Andrew D. Grant. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 Amended #16 OBJECTION for Motion to Remand filed by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 cover page, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Agati, Kathryn)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION for #8 Motion to Remand filed by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 envelope)(Agati, Kathryn)
May 24, 2019 Filing fee received from Andrew D. Grant: $ 400, receipt number 799790 (Agati, Kathryn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Pro Se Appearance by Andrew D. Grant (Agati, Kathryn)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is hereby DENIED in light of the plaintiff's income and assets. Therefore, the court will enter an order remanding this case, with an order prohibiting any further efforts to remove the case to any federal court, if the filing fee is not paid by May 24, 2019. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/16/2019. (Jerjian, O.)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alvin W. Thompson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/14/19.(Johnson, D.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBITS by Andrew D. Grant re #9 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Segment 2, #2 Segment 3, #3 Segment 4, #4 Segment 5, #5 Segment 5A, #6 Segment 6, #7 Segment 6 A, #8 Segment 7, #9 Segment 8, #10 Segment 9, #11 Segment 10, #12 Segment 11, #13 Segment 12, #14 Segment 13, #15 Segment 14)(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 Submission 1 by Andrew D. Grant re #9 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Segment 1, #2 Segment 2, #3 Segment 3, #4 Segment 4)(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT A by Andrew D. Grant re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Murphy, Tatihana)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand)(Dziedzic, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Dziedzic on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Dziedzic, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., filed by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 05/6/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2019. Discovery due by 11/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/06/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrew D. Grant from State of Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of New Britain, case number HHBCV186041375., filed by Andrew D. Grant. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Supplement)(Murphy, Tatihana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A. Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: William R. Dziedzic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?