Elite Construction Rentals, Inc. et al v. Berkley Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Douglas Garage Door Center, Inc., Elite Construction Rentals, Inc. and Universal Foundations, Inc.
Defendant: Berkley Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00686
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Berkley Insurance Company. (Sobba, Chris)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Berkley Insurance Company.Responses due by 7/19/2019 (Sobba, Chris)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sharon Kennedy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312144) by Berkley Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Sharon)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Kennedy on behalf of Berkley Insurance Company (Kennedy, Sharon)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher P. Sobba to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312193) by Berkley Insurance Company. (Sobba, Chris)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Sobba on behalf of Berkley Insurance Company (Sobba, Chris)
June 13, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Berkley Insurance Company. (Smith, E)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/30/2019 on consent to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/13/2019. (Smith, E)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Attorney Christopher P. Sobba to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Attorney Sharon Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2019. (Oliver, T.)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher P. Sobba to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312193) by Berkley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Liberty, Frank)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sharon Kennedy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5312144) by Berkley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Liberty, Frank)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/30/2019on consent respond to complaint by Berkley Insurance Company. (Liberty, Frank)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Berkley Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/6/2019. (Smith, E)
June 6, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Berkley Insurance Company to 7/1/2019. (Smith, E)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/30/19 to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/6/2019. (Smith, E)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/30/19 response to complaint #1 Complaint, by Berkley Insurance Company. (Liberty, Frank)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Liberty on behalf of Berkley Insurance Company (Liberty, Frank)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Berkley Insurance Company by Douglas Garage Door Center, Inc., Elite Construction Rentals, Inc., Universal Foundations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 proposed Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Charles)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elite Construction Rentals, Inc., Douglas Garage Door Center, Inc., Universal Foundations, Inc.. All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Charles)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Berkley Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Charles I. Miller* *Law Office of Charles I. Miller* *PMB 108, 1245 Farmington Avenue* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Douglas Garage Door Center, Inc., Elite Construction Rentals, Inc., Universal Foundations, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2019. Discovery due by 11/6/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 7, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 7, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Berkley Insurance Company. (Miller, Charles)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berkley Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5268950.), filed by Universal Foundations, Inc., Elite Construction Rentals, Inc., Douglas Garage Door Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A)(Miller, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Construction Rentals, Inc. et al v. Berkley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Insurance Company
Represented By: Frank J. Liberty
Represented By: Sharon Kennedy
Represented By: Chris Sobba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Garage Door Center, Inc.
Represented By: Charles I. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Construction Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles I. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Foundations, Inc.
Represented By: Charles I. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?