Stross v. T-N-B Marble -N- Granite LLC
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Defendant: T-N-B Marble -N- Granite LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00688
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Stross. T-N-B Marble -N- Granite LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Lauwers, Steven)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *T-N-B Marble -N- Granite LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven J. Lauwers* *Rath, Young, and Pignatelli, PC* *One Capital Plaza* *Concord, NH 03301-1500*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
May 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to T-N-B Marble -N- Granite LLC. (Lauwers, Steven)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order to T-N-B Marble-N-Granite LLC via regular mail Acknowledgment filed by Alexander Stross. (Lauwers, Steven)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Murphy, Tatihana)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Alexander Stross, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 05/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 05/07/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 05/07/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2019. Discovery due by 11/6/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/7/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 7, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against T-N-B MARBLE -N- GRANITE LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5269212.), filed by Alexander Stross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lauwers, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. T-N-B Marble -N- Granite LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Represented By: Steven J. Lauwers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-N-B Marble -N- Granite LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?