Mirlis v. Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eliyahu Mirlis
Defendant: Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc., Edgewood Corners, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc. and F.O.H., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00700
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/18/19.(Johnson, D.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 15, 2019 to Answer, Move Against or Otherwise Respond #1 Complaint by Edgewood Corners, Inc., Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., F.O.H., Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc.. (Cohen, Joshua)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Colbert on behalf of Edgewood Corners, Inc., Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., F.O.H., Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc. (Colbert, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua W. Cohen on behalf of Edgewood Corners, Inc., Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., F.O.H., Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc. (Cohen, Joshua)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 WRIT of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint Returned Executed as to Edgewood Corners, Inc., Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., F.O.H., Inc. and Yedidei Hagan, Inc.. (Cesaroni, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Edgewood Corners, Inc., Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., F.O.H., Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew K. Beatman* *Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.* *10 Middle Street 15th Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Peterson, M)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Eliyahu Mirlis, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Eliyahu Mirlis, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Eliyahu Mirlis, #5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 05/22/2019. (Peterson, M)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Louis Cesaroni on behalf of Eliyahu Mirlis (Cesaroni, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Alexander Henzy on behalf of Eliyahu Mirlis (Henzy, Eric)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/08/2019. (Peterson, M)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/08/2019. (Peterson, M)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2019. Discovery due by 11/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/08/2019. (Peterson, M)
May 8, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Edgewood Corners, Inc., Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc., Edgewood Village, Inc., F.O.H., Inc., Yedidei Hagan, Inc.. (Beatman, Matthew)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5271493.), filed by Eliyahu Mirlis.(Beatman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirlis v. Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliyahu Mirlis
Represented By: Matthew K. Beatman
Represented By: John Louis Cesaroni
Represented By: Eric Alexander Henzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewood Elm Housing, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua W. Cohen
Represented By: Richard P. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yedidei Hagan, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua W. Cohen
Represented By: Richard P. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewood Corners, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua W. Cohen
Represented By: Richard P. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewood Village, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua W. Cohen
Represented By: Richard P. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.O.H., Inc.
Represented By: Joshua W. Cohen
Represented By: Richard P. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?