Lewis v. Guardian Loan Company et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Lewis
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc, IndyMac Bank, FSB, US Bank Natl Assn, LaSalle National Bank, Bank of America, National Association and Guardian Loan Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00704
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting AS MODIFIED Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff seeks such an extension to respond to #8 Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, to request the Court to act upon her motion for appointment of counsel, and to file an amended complaint. Doc. #9 at 1. The Court notes there is no pending motion for appointment of counsel, and, in any case, waiting for the Court to act upon such a motion would not be good reason to allow Plaintiff to delay her response to the Motion to Dismiss. With respect to Plaintiff's current motion, the local rules require (1) a particularized showing of good cause why the deadline cannot be reasonably met and (2) a statement on non-movants' agreement or objection to her motion or, if they are not responsive, a statement of her diligent efforts to ascertain their positions. D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b). Plaintiff includes neither requirements, nor why a lengthy period of sixty (60) days is needed beyond the current deadline of July 19, 2019. However, given the federal courts' special solicitude towards pro se litigants such as Plaintiff, leniency is warranted here. Accordingly, the Court will grant Plaintiff an additional fourteen (14) days, or up to August 2, 2019, to respond to the #8 Motion to Dismiss and/or file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is warned that any further motions for extensions of time will not be granted if not filed in accordance with the federal and local rules. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 07/09/2019. (Chen, C.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for sixty (60) days by Cynthia Lewis. (Oliver, T.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank of America, National Association.Responses due by 7/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Bank of America, N.A.'s memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Notice to Pro Se Litigant Opposing Motion to Dismiss as Required by Local Rule 12(a))(Grendi, Zachary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holding Corporation for Bank of America, National Association. (Grendi, Zachary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Bennett Grendi on behalf of Bank of America, National Association (Grendi, Zachary)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Bank of America, National Association, Guardian Loan Company, IndyMac Bank, FSB, LaSalle National Bank, US Bank Natl Assn, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Cynthia Lewis* *1020 Old Town Road* *Trumbull, CT 06611*. (Fanelle, N.)
May 21, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Fanelle, N.)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Cynthia Lewis, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 5/14/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2019. Discovery due by 11/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/14/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2019 Filing fee received from Cynthia Lewis: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00010208. (Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, National Association, Guardian Loan Company, IndyMac Bank, FSB, LaSalle National Bank, US Bank Natl Assn, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc, filed by Cynthia Lewis.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Guardian Loan Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Natl Assn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Zachary Bennett Grendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Loan Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?