Barber v. Norwalk Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Angela Barber
Defendant: Norwalk Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv00746
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion on Consent for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff Angela Barber's Complaint dated May 16, 2019 until July 26, 2019 by Norwalk Housing Authority. (LeVasseur, Anne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff Angela Barber's Complaint dated May 16, 2019 filed by Angela Barber. (Barrett, Dan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff Angela Barber's Complaint dated May 16, 2019 filed by Norwalk Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Adam D. Bovilsky, #2 Exhibit Letter to Barber, #3 Exhibit How the Complaint Process Works Printout)(LeVasseur, Anne)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff Angela Barber's Complaint dated May 16, 2019 by Norwalk Housing Authority.Responses due by 7/12/2019 (LeVasseur, Anne)
June 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Norwalk Housing Authority to 6/21/2019. (Smith, E)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2019 to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 6/10/2019. (Smith, E)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2019 responsive pleading #1 Complaint by Norwalk Housing Authority. (LeVasseur, Anne)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Casey LeVasseur on behalf of Norwalk Housing Authority (LeVasseur, Anne)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Barber. Norwalk Housing Authority served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Barrett, Dan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Norwalk Housing Authority* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dan Barrett* *American Civil Liberties Union - CT* *765 Asylum Ave., 1st Floor* *Hartford, CT 06105*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Angela Barber, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Dan Barrett on behalf of Angela Barber, #5 Standing Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 5/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
May 16, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
May 16, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Norwalk Housing Authority. (Barrett, Dan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Barrett on behalf of Angela Barber (Barrett, Dan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norwalk Housing Authority ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5282560.), filed by Angela Barber.(Barrett, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Norwalk Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwalk Housing Authority
Represented By: Anne Casey LeVasseur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Barber
Represented By: Dan Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?