Brown v. Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC

Plaintiff: Christopher E. Brown
Defendant: Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00749
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Christopher E. Brown (Mussman, Louis)
June 14, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC to 7/12/2019. (Lewis, D)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until July 12, 2019 for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/14/2019. (Lewis, D)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until July 12, 2019 for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Christopher E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussman, Louis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ioannis A. Kaloidis on behalf of Christopher E. Brown (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher E. Brown. Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Mussman, Louis)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Louis I. Mussman* *Ku & Mussman, P.A.* *18501 Pines Boulevard, Suite 209-A* *Pembroke Pines, FL 33029*. (Reis, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Christopher E. Brown, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/16/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/16/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/16/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019 Discovery due by 11/15/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2019 Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2019.(Reis, Julia)
May 16, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
May 16, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC. (Mussman, Louis)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5283232.), filed by Christopher E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher E. Brown
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: Ioannis A. Kaloidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capalbo Stonington Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?