Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00763
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/24/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #3 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Murphy, Tatihana)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2019. Discovery due by 11/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
May 20, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.Responses due by 6/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5286997.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?