Notz v. Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities

Plaintiff: Mica Notz
Defendant: Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities
Case Number: 3:2019cv00769
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 OBJECTION re #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 Days After Ruling on Motion to Dismiss to comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) filed by Mica Notz. (Notz, Mica)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/18/2019.(Reis, Julia)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities. (Thurston, Laura)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE REPLY TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Plaintiff shall file by July 23, 2019, any objection to the motion for extension of time (Doc. #16) explaining the basis for the objection. In the meantime, the parties need not file a Rule 26(f) report until such time that the Court may order after considering any objection filed by plaintiff. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/15/19.(Pesta, J.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 Days After Ruling on Motion to Dismiss to comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities. (Thurston, Laura)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mica Notz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Objection to Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Notz, Mica)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Regarding Motion to Dismiss) (Thurston, Laura)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO FILE LOCAL RULE 12 NOTICE. Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 but failed to file the notice required by D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 12 for cases involving self-represented parties. Defendant shall forthwith file and serve the notice required by D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 12, and failure to do so may result in the Court summarily denying the motion to dismiss. In the meantime, plaintiff is advised that she must file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. #12) by July 8, 2019, and that failure to file a timely response may result in the Court summarily granting the motion to dismiss. It is so ordered. Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Responses due by 7/8/2019 Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/18/2019.(Freberg, B)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities.Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Urban, Ralph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura D. Thurston on behalf of Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities (Thurston, Laura)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph E. Urban on behalf of Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities (Urban, Ralph)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/23/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION for to Participate in Electronic Filing Order filed by Mica Notz, #6 Electronic Filing Order (PRO SE), #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Mica Notz, #3 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Mica Notz. Signed by Clerk on 05/22/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Mica Notz* *12 Stonewall Lane* *Branford, CT 06405*. (Barry, Donna)
May 21, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities. (Barry, Donna) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (Barry, Donna).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/21/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/21/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2019, Discovery due by 11/20/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 05/21/19. (Barry, Donna)
May 21, 2019 Filing fee received from Mica Notz: $ 400.00, receipt number 153317. (Barry, Donna)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to Electronic Notice by Mica Notz. (Barry, Donna)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for to Participate in Electronic Filing by Mica Notz. (Barry, Donna)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities filed by Mica Notz. (Attachments: #1 Request for Declaratory Ruling and Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit 1) (Barry, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Notz v. Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities
Represented By: Laura D. Thurston
Represented By: Ralph E. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mica Notz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?